HOFER
In Re: DONALD HOFER
Case Number: 2:2022cv04646
Filed: November 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 Copy of Order/Notice dated 12/7/22 (Document # 3) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DONALD HOFER for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (JL)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 Copy of Order/Notice dated 11/18/22 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Donald Hofer for the following reason: Released from Custody on 11/17/22. (dt)
December 8, 2022 PAPER #3 MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH FORMS (JL)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF HOFER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS EITHER PAY THE $402 FILING FEE OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MAIL HOFER A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S CURRANT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ALSO MAIL HOFER A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF HOFER FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/7/22. 12/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
November 23, 2022 Pro Se Guideline Notice mailed to Plaintiff Donald Hofer. (DT)
November 18, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. (mbh)
November 18, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint filed by DONALD HOFER. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP)(mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: DONALD HOFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?