GILMORE v. TAYLOR ET AL
Plaintiff: KHALIL GILMORE
Defendant: UNKNOWN PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICERS 1-4, Officer Clyde Taylor, Jr., Officer Roy Reese and Detective Robert Lyons
Case Number: 2:2022cv04648
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Robert Lyons, Roy Reese, Clyde Taylor, Jr..Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(Zurbriggen, Adam)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Ross Zurbriggen on behalf of Robert Lyons, Roy Reese, Clyde Taylor, Jr. with Certificate of Service(Zurbriggen, Adam)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KHALIL GILMORE re: Stephanie Segal served Summons and Complaint upon Robert Lyons, Roy Reese, Clyde Taylor, Jr. by personal. Robert Lyons served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Roy Reese served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023; Clyde Taylor, Jr. served on 12/27/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (OXMAN, JOSEPH)
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Lyons, Roy Reese, Clyde Taylor, Jr.. (amas)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clyde Taylor, Jr., Roy Reese, Robert Lyons, filed by KHALIL GILMORE.(OXMAN, JOSEPH)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN CIVIL ACTION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16326288.), filed by Khalil Gilmore.(OXMAN, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILMORE v. TAYLOR ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALIL GILMORE
Represented By: JOSEPH S. OXMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN PHILADELPHIA POLICE OFFICERS 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Clyde Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Ross Zurbriggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Roy Reese
Represented By: Adam Ross Zurbriggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Robert Lyons
Represented By: Adam Ross Zurbriggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?