MURPHY et al v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.
Plaintiff: NANCY MURPHY and ROBERT STEWART
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JEFFERSON HEALTH and META PLATFORMS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv04674
Filed: November 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2710 Electronic Communication Protection Act (ECPA)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by NANCY MURPHY, ROBERT STEWART re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Doe v. Meta, #2 Exhibit B - Doe v. Regents)(COHEN, DAVID)
September 14, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. re #30 Memorandum, #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCANDREW, EDWARD)
April 11, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief filed by NANCY MURPHY, ROBERT STEWART.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint)(COHEN, DAVID)
April 6, 2023 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCANDREW, EDWARD)
March 27, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by NANCY MURPHY, ROBERT STEWART.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A - SAC Clean, #4 Exhibit SAC Ex 1 - HHS Guidance, #5 Exhibit B - SAC Showing Tracked Changes)(COHEN, DAVID)
March 13, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCANDREW, EDWARD)
March 13, 2023 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Thomas Jefferson University Hospital System by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC..(MCANDREW, EDWARD)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT, BECAUSE GOOD CAUSE EXISTS TO TRANSFER PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST META ONLY TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA FOR CONSOLIDATION WITH IN RE META PIXEL HEALTHCARE LITIGATION, THE JOINT MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER #19 IS GRANTED, PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST META IN COUNTS I, II, AND III OF THE COMPLAINT #1 ARE SEVERED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THOSE COUNTS ONLY TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA FOR CONSOLIDATION WITH IN RE META PIXEL HEALTHCARE LITIGATION, NO. 3:22-CV-03580-WHO (N.D. CAL.). PLAINTIFFS REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST JEFFERSON HEALTH IN COUNTS I, IV AND V OF THE COMPLAINT SHALL NOT BE TRANSFERRED; AS IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/27/23.2/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS #23 IS DENIED AS MOOT BECAUSE PLAINTIFFS TIMELY FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. #24 JEFFERSON SHALL ANSWER OR RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE MONDAY, MARCH 13, 2023.2/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
February 27, 2023 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against META PLATFORMS, INC., THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC., filed by NANCY MURPHY, ROBERT STEWART. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HHS Press Release)(COHEN, DAVID)
February 27, 2023 CLAIMS AGAINST META IN COUNT I, II, AND III OF THE COMPLAINT #1 HAVE BEEN TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (bw)
February 14, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCANDREW, EDWARD)
February 14, 2023 Filing 22 Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/30/23 (Document # 21) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to LAUREN ROSENBLUM GOLDMAN for the following reason: ATTEMPTED-UNKNOWN ADDRESS; ORDER #21 HAS BEEN E-MAILED TO COUNSEL, LAUREN ROSENBLUM GOLDMAN ON 2/14/23.. (bw)
January 31, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 21 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL (bw) *MAILED IN ERROR; COUNSEL HAS EMAIL* Modified on 1/31/2023 (lisad, ).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT THE COURT GRANTS META PLATFORMS, INC.'S CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT META PLATFORMS, INC. SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 30 DAYS AFTER THE COURT RULES ON PLAINTIFFS AND META'S FORTHCOMING JOINT MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST META TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/30/23. 1/30/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (JL)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LAUREN R. GOLDMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/30/23. 1/30/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
January 27, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims Against Meta Platforms, Inc. filed by META PLATFORMS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren R. Goldman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
January 27, 2023 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by META PLATFORMS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
January 27, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren R. Goldman by META PLATFORMS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16463159.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
January 27, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by META PLATFORMS, INC..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
January 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL GUNDERSON on behalf of META PLATFORMS, INC. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR, ATTORNEY ELIZABETH A. SCULLY TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, for THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/27/23. 1/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Scully by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16458854.). (KADOURA, JUSTIN)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN KADOURA on behalf of THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(KADOURA, JUSTIN)
January 5, 2023 COPY OF DOC. NO. 11 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. (bw)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL AND THROUGH FEBRUARY 14, 2023 TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/4/23.1/4/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(bw) Modified on 1/5/2023 (lisad, ).
January 4, 2023 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCANDREW, EDWARD)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC, ATTORNEY TERESA M. BECVAR for NANCY MURPHY, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/8/22. 12/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(bw)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Orders (5 & 7) mailed to Unrep Thomas Jefferson Universitv Hospitals, Inc. (fdc)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Order #9 mailed to Unrep. (fdc)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teresa M. Becvar by NANCY MURPHY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16357457.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(BECVAR, TERESA)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF, ATTORNEY RYAN F. STEPHAN for NANCY MURPHY, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/6/22. 12/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (bw)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan F. Stephan by NANCY MURPHY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16355026.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(STEPHAN, RYAN)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC, ATTORNEY JAMES B. ZOURAS for NANCY MURPHY, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/6/22. 12/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(bw) Modified on 12/7/2022 (bw).
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James B. Zouras by NANCY MURPHY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16354658.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(ZOURAS, JAMES)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NANCY MURPHY. META PLATFORMS, INC. waiver sent on 11/30/2022, answer due 1/29/2023. (COHEN, DAVID)
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to META PLATFORMS, INC., THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/22/22 (bw)
November 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against META PLATFORMS, INC., THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16329262.), filed by NANCY MURPHY, ROBERT STEWART. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(COHEN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY et al v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY MURPHY
Represented By: DAVID J. COHEN
Represented By: RYAN F. STEPHAN
Represented By: JAMES B. ZOURAS
Represented By: TERESA M. BECVAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STEWART
Represented By: DAVID J. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JEFFERSON HEALTH
Represented By: EDWARD J. MCANDREW
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. SCULLY
Represented By: JUSTIN KADOURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META PLATFORMS, INC.
Represented By: LAUREN ROSENBLUM GOLDMAN
Represented By: KARL GUNDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?