IN RE: MONTAGUE
In Re: MICHAEL MONTAGUE
Case Number: 2:2022cv04718
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 EXHIBITS FILED BY, MICHAEL MONTAGUE.(amas)
January 6, 2023 DOC. NO. #5 ALONG WITH A 2254 PETITION FORM, A PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FORM, AND IFP FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE ON 1/6/23. (amas)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MONTAGUE THE FOLLOWING: (1) A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A HABEAS CORPUS PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER; (2) A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS GENERAL COMPLAINT FORM FOR PRISONERS TO FILE A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION, BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER; AND (3) A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. MONTAGUE SHOULD NOT FILL OUT BOTH FORMS. HE SHALL SUBMIT ALL CLAIMS USING ONE OF THESE STANDARD FORMS, SIGN THE COMPLETED FORM, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IN ADDITION TO COMPLETING THE APPROPRIATE FORM, MONTAGUE SHALL EITHER SUBMIT THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE OR, IF HE CANNOT AFFORD THE FEES, FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. MONTAGUE MUST DO SO WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF MONTAGUE FILES A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE MUST ALSO SUBMIT A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/5/23. 1/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas)
December 29, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, FILED BY MICHAEL MONTAGUE. (amas)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF MONTAGUE SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS FILING AS A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS, EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL MONTAGUE A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM. ADDITIONALLY, IF MONTAGUE SEEKS TO PROCEED BY WAY OF A CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT, HE MUST FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL MONTAGUE A BLANK COPY OF THE COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION, AS WELL AS A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PETITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 12/6/22. 12/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP, COMPLAINT, AND PETITION FORMS.(amas)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (MAILED TO PRO SE 11/28/22)(amas)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by MICHAEL MONTAGUE.(amas) (NO FILING FEE PAID OR IFP) Modified on 11/29/2022 (lvj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: MONTAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: MICHAEL MONTAGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?