DAVIS v. MEYER et al
Plaintiff: TYSHEED DAVIS
Defendant: ERNEST MEYER, HAKEEM BROWN, RASHON WATSON, QMAR ROBINSON, MELVIN PARHAM, WYLE THOMAS, NAFIS BROWN, DANILE BROWN, KENNYATTA JOHNSON, ROBERT WILLIAM, MEEK MILL, KENNY GAMBLE and NYLMAH DEBOSE
Case Number: 2:2022cv04836
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 Notice filed by TYSHEED DAVIS (mbh)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 Letter dated 12/15/22 by TYSHEED DAVIS. (mbh)
December 22, 2022 COPY OF DOC. NO. 5 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE (bw)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED. IF MR. DAVIS SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST REMIT $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IN THE EVENT MR. DAVIS PAYS THE FEES, THE CLERK SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONSES UNTIL SO ORDERED, SO THAT THE COURT MAY SCREEN THE COMPLAINT. IF MR. DAVIS FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/20/22.12/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL TYSHEED DAVIS.(mbh)
December 8, 2022 Notice of Pro Se Guidelines (#3) mailed to Davis. (fdc)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. (mbh)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 Complaint against DANILE BROWN, HAKEEM BROWN, NAFIS BROWN, NYLMAH DEBOSE, KENNY GAMBLE, KENNYATTA JOHNSON, ERNEST MEYER, MEEK MILL, MELVIN PARHAM, QMAR ROBINSON, WYLE THOMAS, RASHON WATSON and ROBERT WILLIAM filed by TYSHEED DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mbh)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY TYSHEED DAVIS. (mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. MEYER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYSHEED DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAKEEM BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASHON WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QMAR ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELVIN PARHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYLE THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAFIS BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANILE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNYATTA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILLIAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEEK MILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNY GAMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYLMAH DEBOSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?