OWENS v. SELENE FINANCE
Plaintiff: KENNETH ROY OWENS
Defendant: SELENE FINANCE and JOSEPH DAVILA
Case Number: 2:2022cv04841
Filed: December 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 19 TRUTH AFFIDAVIT, COPYRIGHT FORM, COPYRIGHT, CERTIFIED RECEIPT by KENNETH ROY OWENS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 COPYRIGHT FORM, #2 COPYRIGHT, #3 CERTIFIED RECEIPT, #4 COVER LETTER)(rf, )
January 31, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to JOSEPH DAVILA. (rf, )
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 TRUTH AFFIDAVIT, CLAIM AFFIDAVIT by KENNETH ROY OWENS. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 CLAIM AFFIDAVIT, #2 COVER LETTER)(rf, )
January 30, 2023 Filing 16 Letter Rogatory For Relief, Letter of Requirement by KENNETH ROY OWENS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 LETTER OF REQUIREMENT, #2 COVER LETTER)(rf, )
January 27, 2023 Filing 15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SELENE FINANCE.Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, Declaration of Michael C. Hughes with exhibits, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Hughes Declaration w Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. HUGHES on behalf of SELENE FINANCE with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUGHES, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUGMENT by KENNETH ROY OWENS., EXHIBITS, NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 COVER SHEET)(rf, )
January 13, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SELENE FINANCE, filed by KENNETH ROY OWENS. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED*(rf, )
January 10, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by MARCUS MARTINEZ re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon SELENE FINANCE/JOSEPH A DAVILA-CEO OF SELENE FINANCE by PERSONAL SERVICE on 12/13/22 *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by MARCUS MARTINEZ re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon SELENE FINANCE by PERSONAL SERVICE on 12/13/22 (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, ) Modified on 12/14/2022 (rf, ).
December 12, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by KENNETH ROY OWENS. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
December 11, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF TRUTH by KENNETH ROY OWENS. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, )
December 11, 2022 Filing 7 TRADEMARK SIGNED by KENNETH ROY OWENS.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, )
December 11, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF NON RESPONSE, AFFIDAVIT OF PEACE, POWER OF ATTORNEY by KENNETH ROY OWENS.. *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 POWER OF ATTORNEY, #3 EMAIL)(rf, )
December 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SELENE FINANCE. (rf, )
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 20004673 (sbt)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF OWENS SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS EITHER PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. OWENS SHALL BE PROVIDED WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON PRISONER APPLICATION PROCEED IFP, ETC. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/8/22. 12/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *IFP PACKET EMAILED TO OWENS*(rf, )
December 4, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (rf, )
December 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SELENE FINANCE, filed by KENNETH ROY OWENS. *NO IFP. NO FEE PAID* *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. SELENE FINANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH ROY OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELENE FINANCE
Represented By: MICHAEL C. HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH DAVILA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?