IN RE: WILSON
In Re: VINCENT WILSON
Case Number: 2:2022cv04863
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 Copy of Order/Notice dated 12/5/22 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Vincent Wilson for the following reason: Not Deliverable as addressed Unable to Forward. (re-mailed to: VINCENT WILSON 189816 ARLINGTON COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY 1435 NORTH COURTHOUSE ROAD ARLINGTON, VA 22201)(dt) Modified on 1/30/2023 (dt).
December 12, 2022 Document #3 Mailed to Pro Se Vincent Wilson. (DT)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT WE DISMISS THIS CASE AS THERE IS NO POSSIBLE PLEAD NEXUS TO THIS DISTRICT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE PETITIONER SEEKING RELIEF IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OR EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA AS THEY APPEAR TO HAVE SOME NEXUS TO HIS CLAIMS FOR ACCESS TO THE COURTS WHILE INCARCERATED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/9/22. 12/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
December 9, 2022 Document 2 MAILED TO PRO SE. (er)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. (mbh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint filed by VINCENT WILSON. (NO IFP; NO FEE PAID)(mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VINCENT WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?