HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA v. PROMANAGED INC. et al
Plaintiff: HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant: PROMANAGED INC., PRO-MANAGED LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS III LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS IV LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS V LLC, Gary Rilling and William Smith
Case Number: 2:2022cv04894
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT ORDERED: IMMEDIATELY UPON ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS AGREE NOT TO DISCRIMINATE AGAINST PROSPECTIVE OR CURRENT TENANT(S) BASED ON THE TENANTS SOURCE OF INCOME, INCLUDING THEIR USE OF HOUSING CHOICE VOUCHERS. WITHIN TWENTY (20) CALENDAR DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS MUST INCLUDE THE TEXT APPLICANTS WITH HOUSING VOUCHERS AND SUBSIDIES, INCLUDING HOUSING CHOICE OR SECTION 8 VOUCHERS, ARE ENCOURAGED AND ACCEPTED IN ALL PRINT AND DIGITAL RENTAL PROPERTY LISTINGS AND ADVERTISEMENTS, INCLUDING PROPERTY LISTINGS AND ADVERTISEMENTS ON PROMANAGED.US. WRITTEN POLICY: WITHIN TWENTY (20) CALENDAR DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANTS SHALL ADOPT A WRITTEN POLICY AND PRACTICE, WITH SUBSTANTIAL INPUT AND REVIEW BY HECS COUNSEL, THAT COMPLIES WITH BOTH THE PHILADELPHIA FAIR PRACTICES ORDINANCE. PUBLICATION OF THE WRITTEN POLICY: WITHIN TWENTY (20) CALENDAR DAYS OF THE FINALIZATION OF THE WRITTEN POLICY. WITHIN SIXTY (60) CALENDAR DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, ALL OF DEFENDANTS CURRENT AGENTS AND PERSONNEL, INCLUDING PROPERTY OWNERS, INVOLVED IN THE LEASING OF DEFENDANTS RENTAL PROPERTY PORTFOLIO MUST SCHEDULE, ATTEND, AND COMPLETE TRAINING ON PHILADELPHIA FAIR PRACTICES ORDINANCE AND FHA COMPLIANCE ADMINISTERED BY HEC. THIS MATTER IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, BUT THIS COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THIS LAWSUIT FOR PURPOSES OF INTERPRETATION AND ENFORCEMENT OF THIS ORDER; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/23/23. 1/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
December 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by SARA Ann BERNSTEIN on behalf of HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(BERNSTEIN, SARA)
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Enter Consent Order filed by HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Order)(BIZAR, STEVEN)
December 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN C. MILSTEIN on behalf of PRO-MANAGED LLC, PROMANAGED INC., REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS III LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS IV LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS V LLC, GARY RILLING, WILLIAM SMITH with Certificate of Service(MILSTEIN, ALAN)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl)
December 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA re #1 Complaint (Attorney) of corrected Designation Form. (BIZAR, STEVEN)
December 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PRO-MANAGED LLC, PROMANAGED INC., REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS III LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS IV LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS V LLC, GARY RILLING, WILLIAM SMITH. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/9/22 (bw)
December 9, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is blank. The Yes/No questions need to be answered and a signature is required. (sbt)
December 8, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA. (JL)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. COSTIGAN on behalf of HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA (COSTIGAN, DAVID)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. MILLER on behalf of HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA (MILLER, THOMAS)
December 8, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA.(BIZAR, STEVEN)
December 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16361588.), filed by HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BIZAR, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA v. PROMANAGED INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING EQUALITY CENTER OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: DAVID M. COSTIGAN
Represented By: THOMAS J. MILLER
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: SARA Ann BERNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMANAGED INC.
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO-MANAGED LLC
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS III LLC
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS IV LLC
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVO CAPITAL PARTNERS V LLC
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rilling
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Smith
Represented By: ALAN C. MILSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?