DEMBROW v. GIOVANNETTI et al
Plaintiff: DANA LEE DEMBROW
Defendant: SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) formerly known as GESF-E, INC. also known as SYNCHRONY BANK doing business as CARE CREDIT, ATHENA ALEXSANDRIA GIOVANNETTI, MICHAEL SHAFRAN, GESF-E, INC., SYNCHRONY BANK and ATHENA ALEXANSDRIA GIOVANNETTI
Case Number: 2:2022cv04982
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Memorandum filed by DANA LEE DEMBROW. Certificate of Service. Envelope. (va)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition) filed by SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL. (CHUGH, SAMANTHA)
January 11, 2023 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of BUCKS County. (JL)
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DANA LEE DEMBROW. Envelope. (va)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Synchrony Financial with Certificate of Service by SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL.(CHUGH, SAMANTHA)
December 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo ISO MTD, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CHUGH, SAMANTHA)
December 21, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt)
December 21, 2022 Pro Se Guidelines mailed out on 12/21/22. (sbt)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL re Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (CHUGH, SAMANTHA)
December 15, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case Box is incomplete. The Yes/No questions need to be answered and a signature is required. (sbt)
December 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16374409), filed by SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Docket and Filings)(CHUGH, SAMANTHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMBROW v. GIOVANNETTI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONY FINANCIAL (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) formerly known as GESF-E, INC. also known as SYNCHRONY BANK doing business as CARE CREDIT
Represented By: SAMANTHA J. CHUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENA ALEXSANDRIA GIOVANNETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SHAFRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GESF-E, INC.
Represented By: SAMANTHA J. CHUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONY BANK
Represented By: SAMANTHA J. CHUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENA ALEXANSDRIA GIOVANNETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA LEE DEMBROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?