GRANT v. NURSEPARTNERS, INC.
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL GRANT
Defendant: NURSEPARTNERS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00129
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Labor Litigations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GRAHAM F. BAIRD on behalf of CRYSTAL GRANT (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GRAHAM F. BAIRD on behalf of CRYSTAL GRANT (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY, MARCH 28, 2023 AT 9:30 AM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER; CALL-IN NUMBER IS 888-684-8852 (ACCESS CODE: 9715761#). IT IS EXPECTED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE CONDUCTED SUBSTANTIAL DISCOVERY BY THE TIME OF THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE. ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (cc)
February 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY on behalf of CRYSTAL GRANT (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY)
January 31, 2023 Filing 3 Response to First Amended Complaint by NURSEPARTNERS, INC.. (LYMAN, CLETUS)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (afm) (jp).
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NURSEPARTNERS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16425237), filed by NURSEPARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit Motion to Amend Complaint, #4 Exhibit Stipulation, #5 Exhibit State Action Docket, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Designation Form Designation Form)(LYMAN, CLETUS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRANT v. NURSEPARTNERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL GRANT
Represented By: MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY
Represented By: Paul Carrion
Represented By: GRAHAM F. BAIRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSEPARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: CLETUS P. LYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?