ROBINSON v. THE STATE OF DELAWARE DNB#037802962 et al
Plaintiff: DEVIN ROBINSON
Defendant: THE STATE OF DELAWARE DNB#037802962 and CITY OF WILMINGTON DNB#067393900
Case Number: 2:2023cv02491
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION TO REQUEST SERVICE filed by DEVIN ROBINSON., ENVELOPE ATTACHED.(rf, )
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION, filed by DEVIN ROBINSON..(sg)
July 3, 2023 DOCS 3 & 4 MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CITY OF WILMINGTON DNB#067393900, THE STATE OF DELAWARE DNB#037802962. (rf, )
June 28, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (rf, )
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 20010659 (rf, )
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF WILMINGTON DNB#067393900, THE STATE OF DELAWARE DNB#037802962 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 20010659.), filed by DEVIN ROBINSON., EXHIBITS, JURY TRIAL DEMAND, *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. THE STATE OF DELAWARE DNB#037802962 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF DELAWARE DNB#037802962
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF WILMINGTON DNB#067393900
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?