MCCRAY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: DONALD MCCRAY
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv03441
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Referring Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Order #10, 1983 Complaint Packet & IFP Short Form mailed to McCray. (fdc)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT ORDERS FILED ON 9/25/23 (DOC. 5) AND 10/2/23 (DOC. 7) BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLORET ARE VACATED. CLERK OF COURT SHALL REOPEN CASE. LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. 6) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MCCRAY WITH A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IFP FORM BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. CLERK SHALL FURNISH MCCRAY WITH A BLANK COPY OF COURTS FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 10/24/23. 10/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO MCCRAY.(rf, )
October 24, 2023 DOC 9 MAILED TO MCCRAY (rf, )
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET TO HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/23/23. 10/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO MCCRAY.(rf, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 PETITION FOR JOINT PARTY TO MAKE (A) DEFENDANT by DONALD MCCRAY. (rf, )
October 3, 2023 DOC 7 MAILED TO MCCRAY (rf, )
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 10/2/23.10/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO MCCRAY.(rf, ) *VACATED PER COURT ORDER OF 10/24/23, DOC. 10*
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DONALD MCCRAY..(rf, )
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 9/25/23. 9/26/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(rf, ) *VACATED PER COURT ORDER OF 10/24/23, DOC. 10*
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT MCCRAY EITHER PAY THE $402 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, OR IF MCCRAY SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL FILE AN APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, ETC. CLERK SHALL SEND MCCRAY AN APPROPRIATE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP, BEARING CASE NUMBER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 9/7/23. 9/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH APPROPRIATE IFP PACKET.(rf, )
September 7, 2023 PRO SE E CONSENT MAILED TO MCCRAY (rf, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment *MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF* (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(rf, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES MAILED TO MCCRAY(rf, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by DONALD MCCRAY. *NO IFP FILED. NO FEE PAID*(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCRAY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD MCCRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?