PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY
Plaintiff: PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2023cv03650
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY As To Defendant Russell Roofing Company(BENNETT, RYAN)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (BENNETT, RYAN)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/19/23. 10/19/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY waiver sent on 9/20/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (BENNETT, RYAN)
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(BENNETT, RYAN)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY. Forwarded To: Ryan Bennett on 9/20/23 (fdc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY of Completed Designation Form (BENNETT, RYAN)
September 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16957029.), filed by PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF MAE LING YOU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BENNETT, RYAN)
September 20, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Civil Box needs to be checked off. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALISADES PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: RYAN A. BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL ROOFING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?