BARR v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BARR
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 2:2023cv04018
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Filing 10 Notice CONSENTING Magistrate Consent by MICHELLE BARR.(DUNN, JENNIFER)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JENNIFER L. DUNN, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #4 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 10/20/23.10/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 Social Security Standing Procedural Order 10/23/23 Entered and copies e-mailed. (amas)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 10/20/23.10/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
October 20, 2023 Service made electronically as to the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (amas)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHELLE BARR..(OSTERHOUT, KARL) Modified on 10/23/2023 (nd).
October 19, 2023 Filing 5 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(amas)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17015505.) filed by MICHELLE BARR.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHELLE BARR..(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by MICHELLE BARR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by MICHELLE BARR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(OSTERHOUT, KARL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARR v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BARR
Represented By: KARL E. OSTERHOUT
Represented By: JENNIFER L. DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?