SMALL v. JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: ELWOOD SMALL
Defendant: THEODORE W. JOHNSON and JOHN DOE and/or JANE DOE
Case Number: 2:2023cv04809
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 PAPER #1, #8 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL) (NOT MAILED BECAUSE SUMMONS WAS ISSUED IN ERROR)
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued FILED IN ERROR. (sg) Modified on 1/18/2024 (sg). (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/18/2024) (lisad, ).
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 20016600 (sbt)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 Letter dated 1/4/2024 by ELWOOD SMALL (sg)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER TO CLERKS OFFICE RE: FILING FEE. (sg)
December 18, 2023 DOC. 4 AND BLANK IFP MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that:1. If Small seeks to proceed with this action he must, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, either (1) pay $405 (comprising the $350 filing fee and $55 administrative fee) to the Clerk of Court, or (2) file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified copy of his prisoner account statement (or institutional equivalent) showing all deposits, withdrawals, and a current balance, from any correctional facility in which he was confined for the six-month period from June 4, 2023 to December 4, 2023, reflecting account activity from that time period.2. If Small is ultimately granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis, he will be obligated to pay the $350 filing fee in installments pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), even if his case is dismissed. He will not be entitled to the return of any payments made toward the fee.3. The Clerk of Court shall furnish Small with a blank copy of this Courts current standard prisoner in forma pauperis form bearing the above civil action number. Small may use this form to seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis if he cannot afford to pay the fees to commence this case. 4. If Small fails to comply with this Order his case may be dismissed without further notice for failure to prosecute.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/15/2023. 12/15/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES, MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE and/or JANE DOE(MEMBERS OF THE PENNSYLVANIA PAROLE BOARD, THEIR AGENTS AND THEIR SUCCESSORS, WHO BY VIRTUE OF THEIR OFFICE AND AS MEMBERS OF THE PENNSYLVANIA PAROLE BOARD, HAVE SOME CONNECTION WITH THE DENIAL OF PAROLE TO PLAINTIFF, AND WHO BY VIRTUE OF THEIR OFFICE AND), JOHN DOE and/or JANE DOE(MEMBERS OF THE PENNSYLVANIA PAROLE BOARD, THEIR AGENTS AND THEIR SUCESSORS, WHO ARE PERSONALLY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE DENIAL OF PAROLE TO PLAINTIFF, AND FOR THE ENFORCEMENT OF 61 PA. C.S. 6137(a) IN THE DENIAL OF PAROLE TO PLAINTIFF), THEODORE W. JOHNSON, filed by ELWOOD SMALL.(sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMALL v. JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELWOOD SMALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORE W. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE and/or JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?