PRESBERY et al v. THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN PRESBERY and SADIRAH HILL MAJETT
Defendant: THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY and JOHN DOES AND JANE DOES #1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv05074
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 5/2/2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5B.(rv)
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Video Conference(FRIEDMAN, DAVID)
December 29, 2023 Filing 10 Notice Re: Arbitration Video Conference (Attachments: #1 Consent)(rv)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE BAD FAITH CLAIM (COUNT IV) OF THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED THAT ANY FUTURE ACTION BY PLAINTIFF ALLEGING BAD FAITH AGAINST PROGRESSIVE MUST BE SEPARATELY FILED UPON THE CONCLUSION OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM FOR UNINSURED MOTORIST BENEFITS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/28/23. 12/29/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE REFERRED TO ARBITRATION. THE ARBITRATION CLERK SHALL SCHEDULE AN ARBITRATION HEARING AT THE EARLIEST PRACTICABLE TIME AFTER 4/28/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/28/23. 12/29/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY TO ARB CLERK.(JL)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION.(FRIEDMAN, DAVID)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION. (TWILLA, DANIEL)
December 22, 2023 Filing 5 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN on behalf of THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FRIEDMAN, DAVID)
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION a/k/a PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY . (INADOMI, DANIEL)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Progressive Corporation by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION a/k/a PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY.(INADOMI, DANIEL)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION a/k/a PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17146793), filed by THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION a/k/a PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(TWILLA, DANIEL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/21/2023) (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRESBERY et al v. THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL W. INADOMI
Represented By: DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN
Represented By: DANIEL J. TWILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL W. INADOMI
Represented By: DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN
Represented By: DANIEL J. TWILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES AND JANE DOES #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN PRESBERY
Represented By: MICHAEL T. VANDERVEEN
Represented By: JERRY A. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SADIRAH HILL MAJETT
Represented By: MICHAEL T. VANDERVEEN
Represented By: JERRY A. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?