KLINGENSMITH v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Plaintiff: TERRY L. KLINGENSMITH
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC. and NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES L.P.
Case Number: 2:2024cv01256
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:24-cv-00307. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 25, 2024 MDL-3094 (Judge PRATTER) Member Case. 2:24-cv-307,Western District of Pennsylvania. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-1256. (sbt)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (rtm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (rtm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (drc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]
March 11, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 3/18/2024. (rtm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP, NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE, INC., NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (rtm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand Presiding. (rtm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S, NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LP, NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE, INC., NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC., NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8151193), filed by TERRY L. KLINGENSMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rtm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/25/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLINGENSMITH v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY L. KLINGENSMITH
Represented By: Frederick S. Longer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?