LANCE-GEIGER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2024cv01855
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. § 7429 IRS: Tax Jeopardy Assessment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Telephone Conference held on 6/28/24 (JL)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/10/24 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 6/21/24. 6/21/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
June 20, 2024 Filing 43 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(McClure, Emily)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES ONLY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/18/24. 6/18/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ON 6/28/24 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE HER AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 6/17/24. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 7/8/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6//17/24. 6/18/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 17, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER re #39 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redline of Amended Complaint))(COMISKY, IAN)
June 17, 2024 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Notice of Jeopardy Assessment), #2 Exhibit 2 (Administrative Protest))(COMISKY, IAN)
June 17, 2024 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 6/17/24. (JL)
June 17, 2024 Filing 37 Proposed Pretrial Order to amend schedule (Joint) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McClure, Emily)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE WITH THE PARTIES ON MONDAY, 6/17/24 AT 4:00 PM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/14/24. 6/14/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 14, 2024 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: A Telephone Conference was held on 6/14/24. (fdc)
June 12, 2024 Filing 34 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED IN THIS CASE ON 6/5/24 #30 IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ON FRIDAY, 6/14/24 AT 10:30 AM. THE PARTIES SHALL EACH FILE THEIR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO LATER THAN THURSDAY, 6/20/24. 6/12/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 11, 2024 Filing 33 Proposed Order to Amend Schedule (Joint) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McClure, Emily) Modified on 6/12/2024 (tjd).
June 11, 2024 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: A Telephone Conference was held on 6/11/24. (fdc)
June 11, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Beaufort Causey, IV on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Causey, Daniel)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ON TUESDAY, 6/11/24 AT 11:45 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 6/12/24.SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/5/24. 6/5/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 5, 2024 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: An off the record Telephone Conference was held on 6/5/24. (fdc)
June 4, 2024 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Three Day Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(COMISKY, IAN)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR WEDNESDAY, 6/5/24 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/30/24. 5/30/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 30, 2024 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: A Telephone Conference was held on 5/29/24. (fdc)
May 29, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NOTICE OF PARTIAL ABATEMENT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Larson, Kari)
May 23, 2024 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: A Telephone Conference was held on 5/22/24. (fdc)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR WEDNESDAY, 5/29/24 AT 4:15 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/22/24. 5/22/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 17, 2024 Set/Reset Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/22/2024 12:30 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. (fdc)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, 5/22/24 AT 12:30 PM. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 6/7/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/16/24. 5/16/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Main Document 22 replaced on 5/17/2024) (fdc). Modified on 5/17/2024 (fdc).
May 15, 2024 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: An off the record Telephone Conference was held on 5/15/24. (fdc)
May 14, 2024 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/15/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON.(mr)
May 13, 2024 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McClure, Emily) Modified on 5/14/2024 (tjd).
May 13, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(McClure, Emily)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND THE 20-DAY PERIOD FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW #17 (AND FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN) IS GRANTED. THE TWENTY-DAY STATUTORY DEADLINE FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW IN THIS MATTER IS HEREBY EXTENDED BY FORTY DAYS PURSUANT TO 26 USC SEC. 7429(C). THE NEW DEADLINE IN WHICH THE COURT MUST RENDER A DECISION IS 7/8/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/10/24.5/13/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 10, 2024 Filing 17 Consent MOTION Extend 20-Day Deadline for Judicial Review filed by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COMISKY, IAN)
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elizabeth Dessables re: served Summons and Complaint upon Internal Revenue Service by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested on May 8, 2024 (COMISKY, IAN)
May 8, 2024 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. Re: A Telephone Conference was held on 5/8/24. (fdc)
May 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Madrene Larson on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Larson, Kari)
May 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bensen V. Solivan on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Solivan, Bensen)
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ian M. Comisky re: served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General of the United States by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested on May 2, 2024 (COMISKY, IAN)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #8 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ISAAC M. HOENIG, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 5/8/24.5/8/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Related Action in the Southern District of Florida (McClure, Emily)
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Katherine McClure on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (McClure, Emily)
May 8, 2024 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/8/2024 AT 12:45 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON.(mr)
May 7, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17449330.) filed by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER.Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Isaac M. Hoenig, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(COMISKY, IAN)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery filed by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(COMISKY, IAN)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER of Expedited Case Schedule and Request for Scheduling Conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COMISKY, IAN)
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Stephen Fierro re: served Summons and complaint upon U.S. Attorney's Office by Hand delivery on May 2, 2024 (COMISKY, IAN)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: U.S. Attorney's Office, Matthew David Lee on 5/2/24 (fdc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by IAN M. COMISKY on behalf of MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER with Corrected(COMISKY, IAN)
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by IAN M. COMISKY on behalf of MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER (COMISKY, IAN)
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17437287.), filed by MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(LEE, MATTHEW) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/2/2024) (afm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/2/2024) (afm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/2/2024) (afm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/2/2024) (afm). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/2/2024) (afm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANCE-GEIGER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGIE LANCE-GEIGER
Represented By: IAN M. COMISKY
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID LEE
Represented By: ISAAC M. HOENIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Emily Katherine McClure
Represented By: Kari Madrene Larson
Represented By: Bensen V. Solivan
Represented By: Daniel Beaufort Causey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?