FORD v. SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-FOREST et al.
Petitioner: JAMEL S. FORD
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT AT SCI-FOREST, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2024cv02551
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt)
June 11, 2024 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-00194. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 11, 2024 Pro Se Guidelines Mailed out on 6/11/24. (sbt)
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/10/2024. (dlh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2024.]
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Blank Application for IFP, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Envelope) (kss) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORD v. SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-FOREST et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMEL S. FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT AT SCI-FOREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?