BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC. v. LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC, INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and JOHN SIRACUSA
Case Number: 2:2024cv03332
Filed: July 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service and compliance)(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(REGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., JOHN SIRACUSA, SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC.(GRADY, JOSEPH)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN J. BECK on behalf of LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (BECK, MARTIN)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(REGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC..(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., JOHN SIRACUSA, SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC.(GRADY, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN SIRACUSA, INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17626509), filed by JOHN SIRACUSA, INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #2 Exhibit A- Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Phila. Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Siracusa Cert. of Service, #5 Exhibit D-Landmakr Cert of Service, #6 Exhibit E-Philadelphia Docket Sheet, #7 Designation Form)(GRADY, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC. v. LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH G. GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH G. GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. REGAN
Represented By: MARTIN J. BECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SIRACUSA
Represented By: JOSEPH G. GRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES C. HAGGERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?