OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2024cv04097
Filed: August 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2024 Filing 11 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (dt)
August 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL E. HAROLD on behalf of OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC (HAROLD, PAUL)
August 14, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHANIEL S. POLLOCK on behalf of OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC (POLLOCK, NATHANIEL)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NATHANIEL S. POLLAK AND PAUL E. HAROLD ARE GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/13/24. 8/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/13/24. 8/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
August 12, 2024 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul E. Harold by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17667325.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FROST, GLEN)
August 12, 2024 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel S. Pollock by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17667310.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FROST, GLEN)
August 9, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: U.S. Attorney on 8/9/24 (dt)
August 8, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC.(FROST, GLEN)
August 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN EDWARD FROST on behalf of OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC (FROST, GLEN)
August 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17662822.), filed by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FROST, GLEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC
Represented By: GLEN EDWARD FROST
Represented By: PAUL E. HAROLD
Represented By: NATHANIEL S. POLLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?