MURRAY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff: MARIA TUCKER MURRAY
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2024cv04874
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6212 Injunctive Relief from IRS Lien
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2024 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (bw)
September 17, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by MARIA TUCKER MURRAY. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed, #2 Exhibit Sealed, #3 Exhibit Sealed)(MILLER, LARRY) Modified on 9/17/2024 (afm).
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #2 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/17/24.9/17/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THE EXHIBITS ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND FILED AT ECF 1-2, 1-3, AND 1-4 UNDER SEAL, UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.1.3. PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO REFILE THESE EXHIBITS WITH PROPER MODIFICATION AND/OR REDACTION OF ALL PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS BY SEPTEMBER 18, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III FOR DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/16/24. 9/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) Modified on 9/17/2024 (lisad, ).
September 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/16/24. SUMMONS E-MAILED TO AUSA ON 9/16/2024. (bw)
September 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIA TUCKER MURRAY.Memorandum.(MILLER, LARRY). (lisad, ).
September 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2:24-cv-4874 against MARIA TUCKER MURRAY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17742939.), filed by MARIA TUCKER MURRAY. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Exhibit SEALED, #3 Exhibit SEALED, #4 Exhibit SEALED)(MILLER, LARRY) Modified on 9/16/2024 (afm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURRAY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA TUCKER MURRAY
Represented By: LARRY CHARLES MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?