TRIEU v. SPOTTS
Plaintiff: TUAN ANH TRIEU
Defendant: LAUREN SPOTTS
Case Number: 2:2024cv04876
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by TUAN ANH TRIEU. (mbh)
October 10, 2024 COPY OF DOC. NO. 6 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FAILED TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, AS REQUIRED, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS CANNOT BE ADJUDICATED AT THIS TIME. PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT. ALTERNATIVELY PLAINTIFF CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/8/24. 10/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh)
September 20, 2024 Filing 5 TUAN ANH TRIEU APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL)
September 17, 2024 PRO SE GUIDELINES MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
September 13, 2024 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (mbh)
September 13, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by TUAN ANH TRIEU. (mbh)
September 13, 2024 Filing 2 Complaint against LAUREN SPOTTS filed by TUAN ANH TRIEU. (mbh)
September 13, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY TUAN ANH TRIEU. (mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIEU v. SPOTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREN SPOTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUAN ANH TRIEU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?