STAB et al v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: PAUL STAB and PENNY STAB
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2024cv05539
Filed: October 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons & Complaint upon Attorney General of US by Certified Mail--FRCP 4(i)(1)(A)(ii), (B) on October 29, 2024 (VIOLA, JOSEPH)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/14/2025 AT 10:00 AM VIA VIDEO BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/23/2024. 10/24/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
October 23, 2024 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg)
October 18, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/18/2024 (sg)
October 17, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by PAUL STAB, PENNY STAB (VIOLA, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by PAUL STAB, PENNY STAB (VIOLA, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by PAUL STAB, PENNY STAB re #1 Complaint (Attorney) (VIOLA, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17818393.), filed by PAUL STAB, PENNY STAB.(VIOLA, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2024 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Signature is missing. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAB et al v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL STAB
Represented By: JOSEPH R. VIOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNY STAB
Represented By: JOSEPH R. VIOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?