CHILDS v. CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN E. CHILDS
Defendant: WARDEN and CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Case Number: 2:2024cv06754
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by STEPHEN E. CHILDS..(bw)
January 21, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by STEPHEN E. CHILDS..(bw)
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 Complaint Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 20026504 - Curran Fromhold Correctional Facility (fdc)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING SUBMITTED COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/26/24. 12/26/24 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH FORMS.(JL)
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (fdc)
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,. WARDEN, filed by STEPHEN E. CHILDS. *IFP NOT FILED/FILING FEE NOT PAID* (Attachments: #1 Child's Exhibits)(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHILDS v. CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRAN FROMHOLD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN E. CHILDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?