WILLIAMS v. NORTH COVENTRY TOWNSHIP et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTEN WILLIAMS
Defendant: SEAN KILKENNY, JANE DOE, C. MATTHEW DEICHERT, JOHN DOE I, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, NORTH COVENTRY TOWNSHIP, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, BOROUGH OF POTTSTOWN, CHIEF OF POLICE MICHAEL MARKOVICH, SEAN P. MCGEE and NORTH COVENTRY POLICE DEPT.
Case Number: 2:2024cv06767
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2025 Filing 6 CHRISTEN WILLIAMS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEE OR COSTS.(JL)
January 10, 2025 Filing 5 CHRISTEN WILLIAMS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(JL)
December 31, 2024 DOC. NO. 4 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 12/31/24. (sbt)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERTHAT PLAINTIFF CHRISTEN WILLIAMSS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED BECAUSE, AFTER A THOROUGH REVIEW OF THE INFORMATION SHE HASPROVIDED ABOUT HER INCOME AND ASSETS, I FIND THAT SHE HAS SUFFICIENT ABILITY TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE TO COMMENCE THIS CASE, GIVEN THAT SHE EARNS MORE THAN THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES POVERTY GUIDELINES FOR HER SIZE HOUSEHOLD AND THAT SHE EARNS MORE EACH MONTH THAN HER HOUSEHOLD EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/30/24.12/30/24 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL)
December 20, 2024 COPY OF DOC. NO. 3 W/ E-NOTICE CONSENT FORMS HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE (bw)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES 12/19/24 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED OUT (Attachments: #1 CONSENT TO EMAIL)(JL)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF POTTSTOWN, C. MATTHEW DEICHERT, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE I, JOHN DOE II, JOHN DOE III, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, SEAN KILKENNY, MICHAEL MARKOVICH, SEAN P. MCGEE, NORTH COVENTRY POLICE DEPT., NORTH COVENTRY TOWNSHIP (IFP MOTION PENDING; NO FEE PAID), filed by CHRISTEN WILLIAMS.(JL)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 CHRISTEN WILLIAMS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. NORTH COVENTRY TOWNSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN KILKENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. MATTHEW DEICHERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH COVENTRY TOWNSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF POTTSTOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF OF POLICE MICHAEL MARKOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN P. MCGEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH COVENTRY POLICE DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTEN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?