CLARY v. PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: KANYE CLARY
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES, HAPPY VALLEY UNITED, SUCCESS WITH HONOR NIL, INC., BLUEPRINT SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, JOHN DOES and ABC CORPORATIONS
Case Number: 2:2024cv06793
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2025 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES. (SASSO, GEOFFREY)
February 11, 2025 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1/17/2025 Email, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service)(SASSO, GEOFFREY)
February 11, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Exhibit A - proposed Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SASSO, GEOFFREY)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S ARGUMENT THAT DIVERSITY JURISDICTION CANNOT BE RAISED WHEN THE DEFENDANT RESIDES IN THE FORUM COURT, AS SET FORTH IN PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. A RESPONSE IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 2/18/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/7/2025. 2/7/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
February 4, 2025 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Transfer filed by KANYE CLARY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KATZ, MICHAEL)
February 3, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES [Amended Notice of Removal] (SASSO, GEOFFREY)
January 31, 2025 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KANYE CLARY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(KATZ, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - Affidavit of Rhoades, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B" - Affidavit of Mark Toniatti, #4 Exhibit Exhibit "C" - Affidavit of Matthew Melvin)(SASSO, GEOFFREY)
January 17, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES.Certificate of Conferral, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SASSO, GEOFFREY)
December 30, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW HOPE on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL RHOADES (HOPE, ANDREW)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE REMOVING DEFENDANTS SHALL, ON ECF, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 20, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/26/2024. 12/26/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
December 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/26/2024. 12/26/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
December 24, 2024 Filing 3 State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY.(SASSO, GEOFFREY)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL RHOADES, PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17960824), filed by MICHAEL RHOADES, PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PCCP Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Consents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form)(SASSO, GEOFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARY v. PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KANYE CLARY
Represented By: MICHAEL S. KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: ANDREW HOPE
Represented By: GEOFFREY F. SASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RHOADES
Represented By: ANDREW HOPE
Represented By: GEOFFREY F. SASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPPY VALLEY UNITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUCCESS WITH HONOR NIL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUEPRINT SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?