IN RE: DRAUGHN
Plaintiff: REGINALD DRAUGHN
Case Number: 2:2024cv06890
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2025 Filing 25 Letter dated January 26, 2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN. (envelope attached) (dt)
February 10, 2025 Filing 24 EXHIBITS by REGINALD DRAUGHN.. (sg)
February 10, 2025 Filing 23 EXHIBITS by REGINALD DRAUGHN.. (sg)
February 7, 2025 Filing 22 Letter dated 1/30/25 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (mbh)
February 6, 2025 Filing 21 Letter dated 1/31/25 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (mbh)
February 3, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION OF PRO SE REGINALD DRAUGHN TO DISMISS. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED).(dt)
February 3, 2025 Filing 19 Letter dated January 24, 2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN. (dt)
January 29, 2025 Filing 18 Response by REGINALD DRAUGHN. (sg)
January 29, 2025 Filing 17 Response by REGINALD DRAUGHN. (sg)
January 29, 2025 Filing 16 Letter dated 1/23/2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (sg)
January 29, 2025 Filing 15 Letter dated 1/22/2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (sg) Modified on 1/30/2025 (sg).
January 27, 2025 Filing 14 EXHIBITS FILED BY REGINALD DRAUGHN.. (amas)
January 23, 2025 Filing 13 LETTER TO CHAMBERS DATED 1/13/2025. (sg)
January 23, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by REGINALD DRAUGHN..(sg)
January 16, 2025 Filing 11 EXHIBITS by REGINALD DRAUGHN.. (sg)
January 16, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by REGINALD DRAUGHN..(sg)
January 15, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by REGINALD DRAUGHN..(sg)
January 15, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by REGINALD DRAUGHN.(sg)
January 15, 2025 Filing 7 Letter dated 1/9/2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (sg)
January 15, 2025 Filing 6 Letter dated 1/9/2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (sg)
January 15, 2025 Filing 5 Letter dated 1/8/2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (sg)
January 15, 2025 Filing 4 Letter dated 1/10/2025 by REGINALD DRAUGHN (sg)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT:1. IF MR. DRAUGHN SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION THEN ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 14, 2025, HE MUST EITHER (A) PAY $405 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (B) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT (OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM JUNE 26,2024 THROUGH DECEMBER 26, 2024, REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD. 2. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MR. DRAUGHN A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER.MR. DRAUGHN MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE.3. ADDITIONALLY, IF MR. DRAUGHN SEEKS TO PROCEED BY WAY OF A CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT, THEN ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 14, 2025, HE MUST FILE A PROPER COMPLAINT.4. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND TO MR. DRAUGHN A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, WHICH HE MAY USE TO FILE A PROPER COMPLAINT IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/13/2025. 1/13/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS.(sg) Modified on 1/15/2025 (lvj).
January 3, 2025 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES (DOC. NO. 2) MAILED TO PRO SE ON 1/3/2025. (ahf)
December 26, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (rf, )
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against REGINALD DRAUGHN, filed by REGINALD DRAUGHN. *NO FEE PAID. NO IFP FILED*(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: DRAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINALD DRAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?