IN RE: OLIMPO
Plaintiff: BRYAN ALEXANDER OLIMPO
Case Number: 2:2024cv06892
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Copy of Doc. 3 Order, Copy of IFP form and Copy of civil rights prisoner form sent to Pro Se. (mas)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF OLIMPO SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH A CIVIL ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $405 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT (OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM JUNE 26, 2024 TO DECEMBER 26, 2024, REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL OLIMPO A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MAIL OLIMPO A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, WHICH HE MAY USE TO FILE A PROPER COMPLAINT THAT COMPLIES WITH FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/6/24. 1/7/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas)
December 31, 2024 PAPER #2 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES, NOT MAILED. (va)
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRYAN ALEXANDER OLIMPO, filed by BRYAN ALEXANDER OLIMPO. FEE NOT PAID. NO IFP. (va)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: OLIMPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN ALEXANDER OLIMPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?