RAGGAZINO v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL et al
Plaintiff: ANAYE RAGGAZINO
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL, CHESTER COUNTY PRISON and H.I.G. CAPITAL
Case Number: 2:2024cv06926
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2025 Filing 8 Letter dated 01/24/2025 Re: Request for Pro Se Forms (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Office Response)(pjm)
February 14, 2025 Filing 7 Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by ANAYE RAGGAZINO. (mbh)
February 11, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINIFF ANAYE RAGGAZINO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)
February 3, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF ANAYE RAGGAZINO FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. RE: PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)(dt)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/3/25 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to ANAYE RAGGAZINO for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER; WRONG INMATE NUMBER. (JL)
January 16, 2025 PAPER #2 RESENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF WITH CORRECT INMATE NUMBER. (JL)
January 14, 2025 DOC. NO. #3 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 1/14/25. (amas)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING SUBMITTED COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/3/25. 1/3/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
January 3, 2025 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES (DOC. NO. 2) MAILED TO PRO SE ON 1/3/2025. (ahf)
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (mbh)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint against CHESTER COUNTY PRISON, H.I.G. CAPITAL and PRIME CARE MEDICAL filed by ANAYE RAGGAZINO. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAGGAZINO v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAYE RAGGAZINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.I.G. CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?