BIONDY v. CONGOLEUM CORPORATION t/a CONGOLEUM FLOORING
Plaintiff: ROBERT BIONDY
Defendant: CONGOLEUM ACQUISITION, LLC doing business as CONGOLEUM
Case Number: 2:2025cv00653
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF WILL FILE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ATTACHED TO THE STIPULATION AS EXHIBIT A) WITH THE CORRECTED NAME OF DEFENDANT NO LATER THAN 3/21/2025. ANSWER WILL BE DUE BY 4/11/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/17/2025. 3/17/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
March 17, 2025 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against CONGOLEUM CORPORATION, filed by ROBERT BIONDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Certificate of Service)(DION, SAMUEL)
March 17, 2025 Filing 6 STIPULATION consenting to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by ROBERT BIONDY. (DION, SAMUEL)
March 6, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. DIPIERO on behalf of CONGOLEUM CORPORATION (DIPIERO, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Form)(nd)
February 10, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT BIONDY re: Jeff Brown served Summons and Complaint upon CONGOLEUM CORPORATION by Hand delivery. CONGOLEUM CORPORATION served on 2/7/2025, answer due 2/28/2025. (DION, SAMUEL)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CONGOLEUM CORPORATION. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/6/2025. (ahf)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONGOLEUM CORPORATION t/a CONGOLEUM FLOORING ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18056594.), filed by ROBERT BIONDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(DION, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIONDY v. CONGOLEUM CORPORATION t/a CONGOLEUM FLOORING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BIONDY
Represented By: SAMUEL A. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGOLEUM ACQUISITION, LLC doing business as CONGOLEUM
Represented By: MICHAEL J. DIPIERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?