RTS HOLDINGS, LLC v. ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC.
Plaintiff: RTS HOLDINGS, LLC doing business as ROADONE INTERMODALOGISTICS ROADONE LOGISTICSOLUTIONS LLC
Defendant: ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC. doing business as ROAD1
Case Number: 2:2025cv00860
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: DEFAULT HEARING SET FOR 5/19/2025 10:30 AM IN Courtroom 7B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that if defendant does not file a response in this case on or before April 1, 2025, the Court will enter an order for Default Judgment for the plaintiff and against the defendants.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 3/20/25. 3/20/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jwl)
March 4, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RTS HOLDINGS, LLC re: Kimberly Yost served Summons and Complaint upon ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC. by Personal service on Registered Agent. ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC. served on 2/26/2025, answer due 3/19/2025. (Zell, Laura)
February 26, 2025 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RTS HOLDINGS, LLC.(Zell, Laura)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Form)(nd)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 2/19/25 (mbh)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18080565.), filed by RTS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Zell, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RTS HOLDINGS, LLC v. ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RTS HOLDINGS, LLC doing business as ROADONE INTERMODALOGISTICS ROADONE LOGISTICSOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: Laura Zell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROADONE TRANSPORTATION INC. doing business as ROAD1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?