SKULL SHAVER, LLC v. MY FREE BIRD
Plaintiff: Skull Shaver, LLC
Defendant: My Free Bird
Case Number: 2:2025cv00950
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 Filing 14 Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(sbt)
February 21, 2025 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:24-cv-09586. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Transferring Cases 24-9586 & 24-10796 to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania; Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE these matters. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/20/2025. (mag) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
February 20, 2025 ***Civil Case Terminated. (mag) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
February 6, 2025 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MY FREE BIRD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary S. Barson)(CONROY, REBEKAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
February 5, 2025 Filing 10 Letter from counsel For Plaintiff re OTSC on Jurisdiction re #9 Order to Show Cause,. (SOLIMAN, AHMED) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: No later than 2/6/2025, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE by written submission filed on the dockets, no longer than 10 pages, explaining why these matters should not be transferred to an appropriate forum. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/23/2025. (mag) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
January 7, 2025 Filing 8 Letter from counsel for Plaintiff re #7 Letter. (SOLIMAN, AHMED) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
December 30, 2024 Filing 7 Letter from Defendant to the Honorable Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J. Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (CONROY, REBEKAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
December 19, 2024 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant. Attorney REBEKAH R. CONROY for MY FREE BIRD added. (CONROY, REBEKAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
December 19, 2024 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #6 submitted by MY FREE BIRD on 12/19/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/3/2025. (sms2) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
November 19, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SKULL SHAVER, LLC. MY FREE BIRD waiver sent on 10/21/2024, answer due 12/20/2024. (SOLIMAN, AHMED) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/19/2024) (sms2). [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
November 19, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #5 WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by AHMED M. SOLIMAN on 11/19/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (sms2) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
October 3, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MY FREE BIRD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
October 3, 2024 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (aji, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
October 3, 2024 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
October 2, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by SKULL SHAVER, LLC as to MY FREE BIRD. (SOLIMAN, AHMED) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
October 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MY FREE BIRD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15710923) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SKULL SHAVER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification)(SOLIMAN, AHMED) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]
October 2, 2024 Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/21/2025.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKULL SHAVER, LLC v. MY FREE BIRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skull Shaver, LLC
Represented By: AHMED M. SOLIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Free Bird
Represented By: REBEKAH R. CONROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?