NICHOLLS v. MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE
Plaintiff: LASHIMA NICHOLLS
Defendant: MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE
Case Number: 2:2025cv00987
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 (e)2(a) Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE SHALL FILE A DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1(A)(1) WITHIN (7) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/24/2025. 4/24/2025 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
April 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR A VIDEO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 5/22/2025 AT 4:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/23/2025. 4/23/2025 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
April 22, 2025 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'BOYLE, COLIN)
April 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL NOW STIPULATE AND AGREE TO REOPEN THIS MATTER IN LIEU OF THE FILING OF A SECOND LAWSUIT; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/18/25. 4/19/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
April 15, 2025 Copy of order (Doc. #6 ) mailed to MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE. (fb)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT HER COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/14/25. 4/14/25 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(JL)
March 31, 2025 Document 5 Mailed to: Main Line Healthcare. (DT)
March 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A REVIEW OF THE COURTS RECORDS SHOWS THAT DEFENDANT MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE HAS NOT FILED AN ANSWER OR PLEADING IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE.IF PLAINTIFF LASHIMA NICHOLLS DOES NOT FILE A REQUEST FOR DEFAULT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 55 OR TAKE OTHER APPROPRIATE ACTION IN THIS CASE BY APRIL 11, 2025, I WILL ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST DEFENDANT MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 3/28/25. 3/28/25 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(JL)
March 5, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIMA NICHOLLS re: Jeff Brown served Summons and Complaint upon MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE by Hand delivery. MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE served on 3/4/2025, answer due 3/25/2025. (DION, SAMUEL)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/25/2025. (ahf)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(sbt)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18098040.), filed by LASHIMA NICHOLLS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(DION, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICHOLLS v. MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASHIMA NICHOLLS
Represented By: SAMUEL A. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIN LINE HEALTHCARE
Represented By: COLIN J. O'BOYLE
Represented By: COLIN J. BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?