MONFARED v. ST. LUKE'S UNIVERSITY HEALTH NETWORK et al
Plaintiff: ZIBA MONFARED
Defendant: ST. LUKE'S UNIVERSITY HEALTH NETWORK, ST. LUKE'S PHYSICIAN GROUP, INC. and NAZARETH FAMILY PRACTICE
Case Number: 5:2015cv04017
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Northampton
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F. LEESON
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM/OPINION ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL PROCEED TO ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE WRITTEN ARBITRATION AGREEMENT EXECUTED BY THE PARTIES. THIS CASE IS STAYED PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THOSE PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/2/16. 11/3/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM/OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, ECF NO. 16 IS DENIED AS MOOT; DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ECF NO. 18 IS DENIED; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, ECF NO. 19 IS DENIED; AND PLAINTI FF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW NOTICE OF APPEAL, ECF NO. 20 IS GRANTED. THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL JUNE 22, 2016 TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY ON THE ISSUE OF THE COSTS OF ARBITRATION AND MONFARED'S ABILITY TO PAY THOSE COSTS. NO LATER THAN JUNE 29, 2 016, MONFARED SHALL FILE ANY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HER CONTENTION THAT THE ALLOCATION OF THE COSTS OF ARBITRATION CALLED FOR BY THE LETTER AGREEMENT IS INCONSCIONABLE, DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ANY BRIEF IN RESPONSE NO LATER THAN JULY 6, 2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/8/16. 6/9/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, ECF NO. 7, IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL MAY 23, 2016 TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY ON THE ISSUE OF THE COSTS OF ARBITRATION AND MONFARED'S ABILITY TO PAY THOSE COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/22/16. 4/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONFARED v. ST. LUKE'S UNIVERSITY HEALTH NETWORK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZIBA MONFARED
Represented By: CHRISTINE E. BURKE
Represented By: ARI RISSON KARPF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. LUKE'S UNIVERSITY HEALTH NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. LUKE'S PHYSICIAN GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAZARETH FAMILY PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?