KENNEDY v. JONES et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY
Defendant: JOHN KOSKINEN, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, MICHAEL WRIGHT, BRUCE K. MENEELY, DAVID J. KAUTTER, BRIAN S JONES, MARK W. EVERSON, R.B. SIMMONS, HARRY J. NEGRO, NANCY B. ROMANO, WILLIAM M. PAUL, DOUGLAS H. SHULMAN, CHARLES O. ROSSOTTI, MEGAN BRENNAN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF TREASURER OF THE UNITED STATES, JOVITA CARRANZA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, DAVID JOHN KAUTTER, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and THOMAS MARSHALL
Case Number: 5:2018cv03442
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Allentown Office
County: Lehigh
Presiding Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 JUDICIAL NOTICE by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, FINDING OF FACTS (er, )
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THE TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE TAKE JUDICIAL COGNIZANCE (DOC. NO. 6), TO THE EXTENT THAT THE PLAINTIFF SEEKS ANY RELIEF, IS DENIED. THE MOTION FOR US MARSHAL SERVICE TO PROVIDE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND OBJECTIONS (DOC. NO. 7) IS DENIED AND ANY OBJECTIONS CONTAINED THEREIN ARE OVERRULED. AND THE MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY (DOC. NO. 8) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/27/18.9/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(er, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, BRIAN S JONES, BRUCE K. MENEELY, HARRY J. NEGRO, WILLIAM M. PAUL, NANCY B. ROMANO, R.B. SIMMONS, MICHAEL WRIGHT, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF TREASURER OF THE UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, DAVID JOHN KAUTTER, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, JOVITA CARRANZA, MEGAN BRENNAN, THOMAS MARSHALL, filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(er, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (er, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION FOR US MARSHAL SERVICE TO PROVIDE SERVICE OF PROCESS AND OBJECTIONS filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(er, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE - TAKE COGNIZANCE by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (er, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. NO. 1) IS GRANTED AND THE PLAINTIFF HAS LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 2) IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. THE PLAINTIFF HAS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE THE PLAINTIFF WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A PRO SE LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE PLAINTIFF MAY USE THIS FORM TO FILE HIS AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/21/18. 9/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH CURRENT STANDARD FORMS.(er, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/21/18. 9/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(er, )
August 13, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (jwl, ) Modified on 8/15/2018 (md).
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MARK W. EVERSON, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, BRIAN S JONES, DAVID J. KAUTTER, JOHN KOSKINEN, BRUCE K. MENEELY, HARRY J. NEGRO, WILLIAM M. PAUL, NANCY B. ROMANO, CHARLES O. ROSSOTTI, DOUGLAS H. SHULMAN, R.B. SIMMONS, MICHAEL WRIGHT, filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. JONES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KOSKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE K. MENEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. KAUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN S JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK W. EVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.B. SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY J. NEGRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY B. ROMANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM M. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS H. SHULMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES O. ROSSOTTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF TREASURER OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOVITA CARRANZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID JOHN KAUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?