GILL v. STROUSE et al

Plaintiff: MELISSA M. GILL
Defendant: ANNETTE STROUSE, JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY and LYNN A. STROUSE
Counter Defendant: DR. ANDREA REZNIK and THOMAS, THOMAS & HAFER, LLP
Case Number: 5:2018cv03481
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY. IFP Granted Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk, TPO form Sent to pro se defendant.(DT)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT NAGY IS GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE NOTICES OF REMOVAL ARE DEEMED FILED. CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3490 IS REMANDED TO THE NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(C), BECAUSE A PLAINTIFF MAY NOT REMOVE HIS OWN CASE TO FEDERAL COURT. SEE CONNER V. SALZINGER, 457 F.2D 1241, 1242-43 (3D CIR. 1972) (HOLDING THAT A DISTRICT COURT LACKS JURISDICTION TO ENTERTAIN A NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY A PLAINTIFF). WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, NAGY MAY FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN CIVIL ACTION NUMBER 18-3481 ATTACHING "A COPY OF ALL PROCESS, PLEADINGS, AND ORDERS SERVED UPON" THE DEFENDANTS IN C48-CV-2017-9597 AS REQUIRED BY 28 U.S.C. 1446(A). ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/24/18.8/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MR. NAGY, MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 8/27/2018 (er, ).
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (er, )
August 3, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY. (er, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY from NORTHAMPTON COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEASE, case number C48-CV-2017-9597. (IFP PENDING) (er, ) Modified on 8/22/2018 (md).
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS filed by JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, APPLICATION. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheets)(er, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILL v. STROUSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: DR. ANDREA REZNIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: THOMAS, THOMAS & HAFER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE STROUSE
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH EUGENE NAGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN A. STROUSE
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA M. GILL
Represented By: MICHAEL A. SNOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?