SACKS v. STINSKY et al

Plaintiff: BRIAN SACKS
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER THOMAS FOCHT, POLICE CHIEF STEVEN STINSKY and JUSTIN GRUNDOWSKI
Case Number: 5:2018cv03500
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Allentown Office
County: Berks
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS FOCHT. THOMAS FOCHT waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (SANTIAGO, LETICIA)
September 24, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LETICIA J. SANTIAGO on behalf of THOMAS FOCHT with Jury Demand(SANTIAGO, LETICIA)
September 20, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STEVEN STINSKY. STEVEN STINSKY waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (SANTIAGO, LETICIA)
September 20, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LETICIA J. SANTIAGO on behalf of STEVEN STINSKY with Jury Demand(SANTIAGO, LETICIA)
August 21, 2018 2 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT GOVERNS THE CASE AND CONTAINS RULES OF PRACTICE THAT MUST BE FOLLOWED IN ADDITION TO THIS DISTRICT'S LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/21/18. 8/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
August 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRIAN SACKS. (ahf)
August 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to THOMAS FOCHT, JUSTIN GRUNDOWSKI, STEVEN STINSKY. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/20/2018 (ahf)
August 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS FOCHT, JUSTIN GRUNDOWSKI, STEVEN STINSKY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-12992563.), filed by BRIAN SACKS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GECKLE, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SACKS v. STINSKY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN SACKS
Represented By: PATRICK G. GECKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER THOMAS FOCHT
Represented By: LETICIA J. SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE CHIEF STEVEN STINSKY
Represented By: LETICIA J. SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN GRUNDOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?