JURASINSKI v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: CYNTHIA DIANE JURASINSKI
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2018cv04213
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
1 Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR EDWARD A. WICKLUND SHOULD BE AND HEREBY IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTNER DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA FOR PURPOSES OF THIS CASE ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 10/24/18.10/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK, DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/22/2018. 10/23/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) Modified on 10/23/2018 (kp, ). Modified on 10/23/2018 (td, ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by CYNTHIA DIANE JURASINSKI.. (SAVOY, ROBERT)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kp, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13082750.) filed by CYNTHIA DIANE JURASINSKI.Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SAVOY, ROBERT)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT SAVOY on behalf of CYNTHIA DIANE JURASINSKI (SAVOY, ROBERT)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Errata PROPOSED CONSENT)(rf, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY STANDING ORDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 1/8/18.10/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO HUTCHINSON, EMAILED. (rf, )
October 1, 2018 2 Original Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 10/1/18. 1 Summons to US Attorney for Service. (rf, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE185495.), filed by CYNTHIA DIANE JURASINSKI., EXHIBIT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JURASINSKI v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA DIANE JURASINSKI
Represented By: ROBERT SAVOY
Represented By: EDWARD A. WICKLUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?