RIVERA v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: MADELINE ANDINO RIVERA
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL and NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2018cv04342
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JACOB P HART
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: Atty Gen & Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/22/18. (va, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by MADELINE ANDINO RIVERA.. (DEXTER, JUDITH)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, )
October 10, 2018 3 Summonses and Copies of Complaint Issued as to NANCY BERRYHILL. 3 Forwarded To: US MARSHAL (2) and US ATTY (1) on 10/11/18. (va, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Procedural Order 10/11/18 Entered and copies e-mailed. (va, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE UNITED STATES MARSHALL IS DIRECTED TO EFFECT SERVICE IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 10/10/18. 10/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(mas, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by MADELINE ANDINO RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) Modified on 10/15/2018 (md).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY MADELINE ANDINO RIVERA.DECLARATION IN SUPPORT. PROPOSED ORDER. (mas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADELINE ANDINO RIVERA
Represented By: JUDITH A. DEXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?