SPANGENBERG v. MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC. et al

Plaintiff: OWEN SPANGENBERG
Defendant: OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, LLC, OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC., MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION, SCOTT RAVERT and OSHKOSH, INC.
Case Number: 5:2018cv04915
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 Sur-Reply in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Sur Reply filed by OWEN SPANGENBERG. (SAILER, TODD) Modified on 1/7/2019 (tjd).
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC., OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC., SCOTT RAVERT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ZIEMBA, DENNIS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Reply in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SCOTT RAVERT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(ZIEMBA, DENNIS) Modified on 12/13/2018 (tjd).
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by OWEN SPANGENBERG. Memorandum of Law, certificate of service.(SAILER, TODD) Modified on 12/11/2018 (tjd).
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum of Law filed by OWEN SPANGENBERG. (SAILER, TODD)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Plaintiff s ANSWER to Notice of Removal by OWEN SPANGENBERG. (SAILER, TODD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SCOTT RAVERT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(ZIEMBA, DENNIS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(ZIEMBA, DENNIS) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tjd).
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(ZIEMBA, DENNIS) Modified on 11/27/2018 (tjd).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER OF 11/20/2018. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. 11/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
November 14, 2018 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
November 14, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC., OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC., OWEN SPANGENBERG. (jwl, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent MCNEILUS COMPANIES, INC., Corporate Parent OSHKOSH CORPORATION for MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC.. by MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC..(jwl, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC..(jwl, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC., OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC. from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 181003130. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 187894) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPANGENBERG v. MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSHKOSH SPECIALTY VEHICLES, INC.
Represented By: DENNIS P. ZIEMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEILUS TRUCK & MANUFACTURING, INC.
Represented By: DENNIS P. ZIEMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSHKOSH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT RAVERT
Represented By: DENNIS P. ZIEMBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSHKOSH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWEN SPANGENBERG
Represented By: TODD M. SAILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?