DE RIVERA v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: ALICIA DE RIVERA
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2018cv05199
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
0 Judge: THOMAS J RUETER
1 Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 10 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Nancy Berryhill via FEDEX on 12/19/18. FEDEX Tracking Sheet Attached. (rf, )
December 28, 2018 9 US Marshal Return Re: Served Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General via FEDEX on 12/19/18. FEDEX Tracking Sheet Attached. (rf, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER, DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/26/18. 12/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL(jaa, )
December 26, 2018 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by ALICIA DE RIVERA.. (SAVOY, ROBERT)
December 12, 2018 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
December 4, 2018 5 Procedural Order 12/6/2018 Entered and copies e-mailed. (sg, )
December 4, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL. Forwarded To: 2 TO MARSHAL 1 TO AUSA on 12/6/2018 (sg, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE E.D.P.A. SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE E.D.P.A... SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/4/2018.12/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 3, 2018 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent to Assignment SS Case)(jwl, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/4/2018) (jwl, ).
December 3, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by ALICIA DE RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )
December 3, 2018 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by ALICIA DE RIVERA..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE RIVERA v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA DE RIVERA
Represented By: ROBERT SAVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?