PRIMER v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: JANICE PRIMER
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2018cv05383
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH T HEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 US Marshal Return Re: Summons and Complaint Served upon the Commissioner of Social Security on 1/18/19 via FEDEX and the Atty. General on 1/18/19 via FEDEX. See attached receipt. (jaa, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only).(kp, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Procedural Order 1/2/2019 Entered and copies e-mailed. (kp, )
January 2, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 TO US MARSHAL, 1 TO U.S ATTORNEY on 1/2/2019 (kp, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUES SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/2/2019.1/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by JANICE PRIMER.. (DEXTER, JUDITH)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(er, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by JANICE PRIMER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(er, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JANICE PRIMER. DECLARATION. (er, ) Modified on 12/13/2018 (er, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRIMER v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE PRIMER
Represented By: JUDITH A. DEXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?