FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. v. C&B SUPERMARKET, INC. et al
Plaintiff: FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC.
Defendant: C&B SUPERMARKET, INC. and MURRAY K BATTLEMAN
Case Number: 5:2018cv05522
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/8/2019 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. (sme, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING IS GRANTED AND THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING WILL BE RESCHEDULED TO FRIDAY, MARCH 8, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY IN COURTROOM 6A AND THAT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING THE MARCH 8, 2019 HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/12/2019. 2/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Continue Uncontested Motion for Continuance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, MARY)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION (ECF NO. 17) IS STRICKEN AS THIS STIPULATION (ECF NO. 17) WAS FILED WITHOUT THE APPROVAL OF THE COURT AND WITHOUT ANY UPDATE AS TO THE STATUS OF THE CASE OR CONDITIONS PRECEDENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/11/19. 2/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing re #15 Order, by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. (FASSETT, MARY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/11/2019 (md). (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED ON 2/11/19) Modified on 2/11/2019 (kw, ).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SETTLE THIS MATTER ON THE TERMS SET FORTH HEREIN. THE PARTIES HERETO AGREE THAT THE AFORESAID $14,888.75 SHALL BE PAID OVER BY CITIZEN'S BANK WITHIN THREE (3) BUSINESS DAYS OF RECEIPT OF THIS STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, MARY JEAN FASSETT, ESQ., MCCARRON & DIESS, 4530 WISCONSIN AVENUE, STE. 301, WASHINGTON, D.C. 20016, FOR THE SOLE BENEFIT OF FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. THE SUM OF $20,000.00 WAS WITHDRAWN FROM ACCOUNT ENDING IN NO. 4543 ON DECEMBER 31, 2018, BY DEFENDANTS PRIOR TO ENTRY OF THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, BUT NO FUNDS HAVE BEEN EXPENDED THEREFROM. THE PARTIES HERETO AGREE THAT THE SUM OF $15,500.00 SHALL BE PAID OVER BY DEFENDANTS WITHIN THREE (3) BUSINESS DAYS OFRECEIPT OF THIS STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, MARY JEAN FASSETT, ESQ., MCCARRON & DIESS, 4530 WISCONSIN AVENUE, STE. 301, WASHINGTON, D.C. 20016, FOR THE SOLE BENEFIT OF FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL PAYMENT OF THE $14,888.75 AND $15,500.00 IN FUNDS IS MADE. UPON RECEIPT OF THE FULL PAYMENT OF $14,888.75 IN FUNDS FROM CITIZENS BANK AND THE $15,500.00 IN FUNDS FROM DEFENDANTS BY MARY JEAN FASSETT, ESQ., THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL BE LIFTED AND THE PA11IES AGREE THAT FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. SHALL FILE THE ATTACHED CONSENT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT C & B SUPERMARKET, INC. T/A RICHBORO SHOP N BAG, A/T/A MURRAY'S RICHBORO MARKET, ONLY, UNDER THE TRUST PROVISIONS OF THE PERISHABLE AGRICULTURAL COMMODITIES ACT, 7 U.S.C. 499E(C), FOR ENTRY BY THE COURT, AND A NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT MURRAY K. BATTLEMAN. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/30/19. 1/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 31, 2019 AT 11:00 A.M. WILL BE RESCHEDULED TO WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 13, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M., BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES' STIPULATION, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING THE FEBRUARY 13, 2019 HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/30/19. 1/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re #11 by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. (FASSETT, MARY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/29/2019 (md).
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nadia Tursi re: served Summons and Complaint upon Joanne Williams c/o William J. Benz, Authorized Agent on behalf of MURRAY K BATTLEMAN by Substitute Service on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (FASSETT, MARY) Modified on 1/30/2019 (md).
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nadia Tursi re: served Summons and Complaint upon Joanne Williams c/o William J. Benz, Authorized Agent on behalf of C&B SUPERMARKET, INC. by Substitute Service on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (FASSETT, MARY) Modified on 1/30/2019 (md).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 16, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M. WILL BE RESCHEDULED TO THURSDAY, JANUARY 31, 2019 AT 11:00 A.M., BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES' STIPULATION, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING THE JANUARY 31, 2019 HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/14/19. 1/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Continuation of Hearing re #9 Order, by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. (FASSETT, MARY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/14/2019 (md).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: THAT THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ORIGINALLY SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 8, 2019 AT 2:00 P.M. WILL BE RESCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 16, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/8/2019. 1/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Continuation of Hearing by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC.. (FASSETT, MARY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/8/2019 (md).
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jodi L. Broder re: served Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Certification of Counsel, Declaration of Jonathan Steffy with exhibits, Declaration of Karen Buscavage with exhibits upon Murray K. Battleman by Personal on January 3, 2019 (FASSETT, MARY)
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 1/8/2019 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. (sme, )
December 20, 2018 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC..(rf, )
December 20, 2018 2 Original Summons Issued as to MURRAY K BATTLEMAN, C&B SUPERMARKET, INC forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 12/20/18. (rf, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MURRAY K BATTLEMAN, C&B SUPERMARKET, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE189804 filed by FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC. v. C&B SUPERMARKET, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&B SUPERMARKET, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BENZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURRAY K BATTLEMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BENZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOUR SEASONS PRODUCE, INC.
Represented By: MARY JEAN FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?