KICHLINE v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: TASHA KICHLINE
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 5:2019cv00183
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY R RICE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Social Security Magistrate Consent by TASHA KICHLINE.. (DEXTER, JUDITH)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 US Marshal Return Re: Summons and Complaint Served upon the Commissioner of Social Security on 1/18/19 via FEDEX and the Atty. General on 1/18/19 via FEDEX. See attached receipt. (jaa, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Standing Procedural Order for Case Seeking Social Security Review 1/15/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (jaa, )
January 15, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 2 U.S. MARSHALS AND 1 U.S. ATTORNEYS on 1/15/19. (jaa, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES AS OUTLINED HEREIN AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/15/19.1/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mas, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/15/2019) (jaa, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by TASHA KICHLINE. (mas, ) Modified on 1/15/2019 (afm, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY TASHA KICHLINE. DECLARATION IS SUPPORT. PROPOSED ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KICHLINE v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHA KICHLINE
Represented By: JUDITH A. DEXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?