MOORE v. BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM et al
Plaintiff: WAYMAN MOORE
Defendant: SGT DAVIS, CORRECTION OFFICER ESTES, KITCHEN OFFICER MATA, LT. WEBR, NURSE CHRISTINE SATTER, BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM, PRIME CARE MEDICAL, INC. and JESSE KIRSCH
Case Number: 5:2019cv00512
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by WAYMAN MOORE(jl, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER PAPER #5 HAVE BEEN SENT TO WAYMAN MOORE ON 2/28/19 DUE TO CHANGE OF ADDRESS. (jl, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; IF PLFF. SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/6/19.2/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF. (pr, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by WAYMAN MOORE. (ahf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM, DAVIS, ESTES, JESSE KIRSCH, MATA, PRIME CARE MEDICAL, INC., CHRISTINE SATTER, WEBR, filed by WAYMAN MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) Modified on 2/5/2019 (md).
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY WAYMAN MOORE.(ahf)
February 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WAYMAN MOORE. (ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTION OFFICER ESTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KITCHEN OFFICER MATA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. WEBR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE CHRISTINE SATTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSE KIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYMAN MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?