SWARTZ v. PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC

Plaintiff: HELEN SWARTZ
Defendant: PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC and MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00682
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Amended Complaint - Motion to File Second Amended Complaint - filed by HELEN SWARTZ.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service)(FULLER, LAWRENCE)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HELEN SWARTZ As To Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.(FULLER, LAWRENCE)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC., PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC, filed by HELEN SWARTZ.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Denise Hinkle re: served Complaint upon Stefani Murphy (Intake Specialist) on behalf of MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC. by Corporate Service on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (FULLER, LAWRENCE) Modified on 3/28/2019 (md).
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by HELEN SWARTZ - Notice of Unavailability - (FULLER, LAWRENCE)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HELEN SWARTZ As To Penn Square Associates, LLC, a Pennsylvania Limited Liability Company(FULLER, LAWRENCE)
March 5, 2019 Two (2) Summons Issued as to MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC., PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC. Forwarded To: DAVID S. DESSEN on 3/7/19. (va, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC., PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC, filed by HELEN SWARTZ. (va, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LAWRENCE A. FULLER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/27/19.2/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 2/27/2019 (er, ).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Lawrence A. Fuller, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13377293.) filed by HELEN SWARTZ.Certificate of Service.(DESSEN, DAVID)
February 15, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC. Forwarded To: DAVID DESSEN on 2/19/19 (jl, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE192613.), filed by HELEN SWARTZ. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SWARTZ v. PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN SQUARE ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN SWARTZ
Represented By: DAVID S. DESSEN
Represented By: LAWRENCE A. FULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?