CUTLER v. PELOSI et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY CUTLER
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA NEWSPAPERS INC, MANHEIM SCHOOL DISTRICT, GOOGLE CORPORATION, STATE FARM INSURANCE, WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION, NANCY PELOSI, ERIE INSURANCE, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, U.S. NEWS AND WORLD REPORTS, FULTON BANK, VERIZON CORPORATION, BEND BULLETIN NEWSPAPER, JANE DOES, JOHN DOES, HAVERFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT, ASSOCIATED PRESS, LEMBERG LAW LLC and CITIZENS BANK
Case Number: 5:2019cv00834
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by NANCY PELOSI, NANCY PELOSI.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification Scope Employment, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Interv, #3 Exhibit C - Clouse Declaration)(REID, SCOTT)
April 25, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFF JEFFREY CUTLER SERVED A COPY OF FEDERAL SUMMONS IN CIVIL ACTION DATED 2/26/19, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT DATED 2/26/19 TO DEFENDANTS AS ADDRESSED AND SPECIFIED BELOW VIA DIRECT SERVICE TO THEIR REPRESENTATIVE BY AN INDIVIDUAL OVER THE AGE OF 18 DIRECTLY AT THE FOLLOWING LOCATIONS ON 15APR2019 AS OUTLINED HEREIN by JEFFREY CUTLER (rf, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE THAT PRO SE PLAINTIFF HAS SERVE A COPY OF FEDERAL SUMMONS IN CIVIL ACTION DATED 2/26/19, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT DATED 2/26/19 AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES DATED 3/11/19 TO WILLIAM HAIBER, CEO by JEFFREY CUTLER (rf, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS EFFECTIVE 23APR2019, EXHIBITS by JEFFREY CUTLER. (rf, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by PERRY A. NAPOLITANO on behalf of CITIZENS BANK with Certificate of Service(NAPOLITANO, PERRY)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT CITIZENS SHALL HAVE UNTIL MAY 6, 2019 TO FILE AN ANSWER AND/OR MOTION RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/23/19. 4/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, PRO SE AND ATTORNEY AND E-MAILED.(mas, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEMBERG LAW LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(LEMBERG, SERGEI)
April 22, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by SERGEI LEMBERG on behalf of LEMBERG LAW LLC (LEMBERG, SERGEI)
April 22, 2019 Filing 30 Letter Request for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CITIZENS BANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FALK, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/23/2019 (lisad, ).
April 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. FALK on behalf of CITIZENS BANK with Certificate of Service(FALK, MICHAEL)
April 19, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Philadelphia Newspapers Inc is named as a Defendant in this case, the correct name is Philadelphia Media Network (Newspapers) LLC. Philadelphia Media Network (Newspapers) LLC is owned by Philadelphia Media Network, PBC. with Certificate of Service by PHILADELPHIA NEWSPAPERS INC.(SEGAL, ELI)
April 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PHILADELPHIA NEWSPAPERS INC.Memorandum,Certificate of Service.(SEGAL, ELI)
April 19, 2019 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ASSOCIATED PRESS.(SEGAL, ELI)
April 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS.Memorandum,Certificate of Service.(SEGAL, ELI)
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VERIZON CORPORATION.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service)(CALISTRI, BRIAN)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by STATE FARM INSURANCE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(CARLOS, PAMELA)
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (NO ENVELOPE) by JEFFREY CUTLER (ti, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 8 filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Memorandum In Support of Motion.(MCCORMAC, THOMAS)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR KATHERINE V.A. SMITH, ESQ., IS PERMITTED TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/9/19.4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND TO PRO SE AND ATTONREY ALONG WITH ECF REGISTRATION FORM AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 4/12/2019 (mas, ).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE #15 APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT BE AND HEREBY IS GRANTED. AMELIA SANCHEZ-MORAN., A MEMBER IN GOOD STANDING OF THE BAR OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, SHALL BE PERMITTED TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83.5.2(B). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/9/19.4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND TO PRO SE AND TO ATTORNEY ALONG WITH ECF REGISTRATION FORM.(mas, ) Modified on 4/9/2019 (mas, ). Modified on 4/12/2019 (mas, ).
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA A. CARLOS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE (CARLOS, PAMELA)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HELLER, NATHAN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HELLER, NATHAN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Amelia Sanchez-Moran ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13466068.) filed by WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION.Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(HELLER, NATHAN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN P. HELLER on behalf of WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HELLER, NATHAN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Order Regarding Motion for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine V.A. Smith by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. (MCCORMAC, THOMAS) *FORWARDED TO JUDGE* Modified on 4/9/2019 (lisad, ).
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Katherine V.A. Smith ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13466006.) filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY..(MCCORMAC, THOMAS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.(MCCORMAC, THOMAS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS MCCORMAC on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY (MCCORMAC, THOMAS)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit and Certificate of Service (NO ENVELOPE) by JEFFREY CUTLER (ti, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit and Certificate of Service (NO ENVELOPE) by JEFFREY CUTLER (ti, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH CROSLEY on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE (CROSLEY, SARAH)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA A. CARLOS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE (CARLOS, PAMELA)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES filed by JEFFREY CUTLER. No envelope included. (ti, ) Modified on 4/3/2019 (lisad, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES (NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED) filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ti, ) Modified on 3/20/2019 (ti, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ti, )
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to ASSOCIATED PRESS, BEND BULLETIN NEWSPAPER, CITIZENS BANK, ERIE INSURANCE, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FULTON BANK, GOOGLE CORPORATION, HAVERFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT, LEMBERG LAW LLC, MANHEIM SCHOOL DISTRICT, PHILADELPHIA NEWSPAPERS INC, STATE FARM INSURANCE, U.S. NEWS AND WORLD REPORTS, VERIZON CORPORATION, WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION. 15 Forwarded To: Pro se on 2/27/2019 (ahf)
February 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to NANCY PELOSI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 2 Forwarded To: Pro se & 1 to AUSA on 2/27/2019 (ahf)
February 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JEFFREY CUTLER. (ahf)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSOCIATED PRESS, BEND BULLETIN NEWSPAPER, CITIZENS BANK, ERIE INSURANCE, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FULTON BANK, GOOGLE CORPORATION, HAVERFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT, JANE DOES, JOHN DOES, LEMBERG LAW LLC, MANHEIM SCHOOL DISTRICT, NANCY PELOSI, PHILADELPHIA NEWSPAPERS INC, STATE FARM INSURANCE, U.S. NEWS AND WORLD REPORTS, VERIZON CORPORATION, WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 193071.), filed by JEFFREY CUTLER.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUTLER v. PELOSI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA NEWSPAPERS INC
Represented By: ELI M. SEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANHEIM SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE
Represented By: SARAH CROSLEY
Represented By: PAMELA A. CARLOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIKIPEDIA FOUNDATION
Represented By: AMELIA SANCHEZ-MORAN
Represented By: NATHAN P. HELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY PELOSI
Represented By: SCOTT WEBSTER REID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS MCCORMAC
Represented By: KATHERINE V.A. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. NEWS AND WORLD REPORTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULTON BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON CORPORATION
Represented By: BRIAN L. CALISTRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEND BULLETIN NEWSPAPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAVERFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATED PRESS
Represented By: ELI M. SEGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEMBERG LAW LLC
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK
Represented By: PERRY A. NAPOLITANO
Represented By: MICHAEL C. FALK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY CUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?