Rose v. Department of Labor & Industry, Equal Opportunity Office et al
Plaintiff: JIMI ROSE
Defendant: JANET, Respondents' Superior, Mike Dopkin, Department of Labor & Industry, Equal Opportunity Office and Nancy Dischinat
Case Number: 5:2019cv02483
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE #11 MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ROSE PROCEEDING WITH THIS CASE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S JULY 29, 2019 ORDER (ECF NO. #10 ). ONCE IT IS CLEAR WHETHER ROSE INTENDS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND, ACCORDINGLY, WHO THE DEFENDANTS ARE IN THIS MATTER, THE COURT WILL ADDRESS SERVICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/5/19.8/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION FOR MARSHALL SERVICE FILED BY JIMI ROSE. (mas, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE DEFENDANT RESPONDENTS SUPERIOR FROM THE DOCKET; ETC. AS HEREIN. ROSE IS GIVEN THIRTY (30) DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE EVENT HE CAN ALLEGE ADDITIONAL FACTS TO AMEND THE CLAIMS THE COURT DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. IF ROSE DOES NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE COURT WILL DIRECT SERVICE OF HIS INITIAL COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS DOPKIN AND DISCHINAT; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/29/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/29/19. 7/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00929. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
June 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JIMI ROSE. (jwl, )
June 5, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER -Case is TRANSFERRED to the Untied States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for further proceedings, including the disposition of plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/5/19. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER and STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued; (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM to be attached to Complaint when served by USM (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimi Rose.(ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.] Modified on 6/7/2019 (tjd).
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by Jimi Rose re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Labor & Industry, Equal Opportunity Office, Nancy Dischinat, Mike Dopkin, Janet, Respondents' Superior lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jimi Rose.(ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Department of Labor & Industry, Equal Opportunity Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Respondents' Superior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dopkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor & Industry, Equal Opportunity Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Dischinat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMI ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?