THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC v. VAGNONI et al
Plaintiff: THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI and LUCIANO VAGNONI
Case Number: 5:2019cv02484
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC. THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; BARRY I. VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; DAVID E. VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019; LUCIANO VAGNONI waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (KANTER, GREGG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL F. TROISI on behalf of THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(TROISI, PAUL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. PHILLIPS on behalf of THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(PHILLIPS, CHARLES)
June 27, 2019 5 ALIAS Summons Issued as to THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 6/27/19 (jl, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANTS by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC. (jl, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/7/19. 6/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2019) (mas, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC.(ahf)
June 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI. 5 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/7/2019 (ahf)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI, BARRY I. VAGNONI, DAVID E. VAGNONI, LUCIANO VAGNONI, PHILIP C. VAGNONI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198558.), filed by THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC v. VAGNONI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF GLADYS VAGNONI
Represented By: CHARLES J. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PAUL F. TROISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP C. VAGNONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID E. VAGNONI
Represented By: CHARLES J. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PAUL F. TROISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY I. VAGNONI
Represented By: CHARLES J. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PAUL F. TROISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCIANO VAGNONI
Represented By: CHARLES J. PHILLIPS
Represented By: PAUL F. TROISI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TSG GRAT #9, LLC
Represented By: GREGG KANTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?